U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00136
  • Case Name: Gossens v. US Department of Labor Wage and Hour Division
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Court)]
  • October 13, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 03, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 14, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • July 21, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • July 21, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.