U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-20360
  • Case Name: Nikolas Zuhlsdorf and Susan M. Zuhlsdorf
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • January 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Adversary Case]
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • November 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • October 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Objection to Claim(s)]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Objection to Claim]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Reimburse Fees]
  • January 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • December 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • December 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • December 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • December 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Complaint]
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • December 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • December 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Convert Case From 13 to 7]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Convert Case 13 to 7]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees 341 Minutes]
  • August 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 20, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
  • August 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • August 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Regarding Compliance With Rules]
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
July, 2020
  • July 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • July 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Employee Income Records]
  • July 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • July 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.