U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00139
  • Case Name: Holst Trucking LLLP v. R & R Services Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 08, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • September 02, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • September 02, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • September 02, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 02, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 24, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 04, 2020: [Acceptance of Service]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 24, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.