U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00138
  • Case Name: Frank v. Wyoming Secretary of State
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 09, 2024: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [USCA Order]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Transcript Letter]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • September 22, 2021: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • September 22, 2021: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • September 10, 2021: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • September 08, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • September 07, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • September 03, 2021: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • September 02, 2021: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • September 02, 2021: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • August 25, 2021: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • August 25, 2021: [Stay Case]
  • August 23, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 23, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Cross Appeal]
  • August 20, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 20, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Joinder]
  • August 19, 2021: [Objection]
  • August 05, 2021: [Bill of Costs]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 03, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • July 21, 2021: [Vacate]
  • July 19, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 02, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 18, 2021: [Notice of Joinder]
  • June 18, 2021: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • June 18, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 18, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • May 25, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 25, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 24, 2021: [Vacate]
  • May 21, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • May 21, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 21, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 07, 2021: [Compel]
  • May 06, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 30, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 14, 2020: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 15, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Opposition]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • August 24, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • August 17, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • August 17, 2020: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Joinder]
  • August 17, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 17, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 03, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 03, 2020: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • August 03, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 28, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • July 27, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 24, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • July 24, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.