U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-20370
  • Case Name: Stephanie Ray Bauders
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 07, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • November 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • October 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
  • October 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Objection to Claim(s)]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Objection to Claim]
April, 2021
  • April 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • November 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • July 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • July 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.