U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00142
  • Case Name: Iberlin Ranch Limited Partnership v. Devon Energy Production Company LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • August 19, 2020: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • August 14, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • August 14, 2020: [Stay Case]
  • August 07, 2020: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • August 03, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • August 03, 2020: [Praecipe]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 29, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • July 29, 2020: [Third Party Complaint]
  • July 29, 2020: [Removal]
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • July 28, 2020: [Complaint]
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.