U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00141
  • Case Name: VanWagoner et al v. Singh et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Order]
  • August 28, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 14, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • August 07, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 07, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • August 07, 2020: [State Court Docket Sheet]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 29, 2020: [Removal]
  • July 28, 2020: [Complaint]
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.