U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00143
  • Case Name: Hebert v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on 2255 Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Reply to Response]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Response to Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 14, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 05, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 29, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 29, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 29, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.