U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00144
  • Case Name: Griffith et al v. Western Oilfields Supply Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • January 13, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • December 02, 2021: [Supplement]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 23, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 19, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
  • October 13, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 17, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 13, 2021: [Compel]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 12, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 11, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Protective Order]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • January 06, 2021: [Notice of IPT Conference]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 20, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 20, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 17, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 16, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • November 16, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Reply]
  • October 22, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 19, 2020: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • October 16, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 16, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • October 15, 2020: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • October 15, 2020: [Request for Hearing]
  • October 14, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • October 06, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • October 02, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 23, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • September 23, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 14, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 14, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 09, 2020: [Brief]
  • September 09, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 09, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 26, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 26, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • August 26, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 26, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 24, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 24, 2020: [Order]
  • August 13, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Recusal]
  • July 29, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • July 29, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.