open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Wyoming

WYOMING PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Wyoming
    Case Number:20-20377
    Party Name:Summit Gas Resources, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Smiley, John C [Limit Notice ]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Smiley, John C [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Smiley, John C [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Smiley, John C [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Smiley, John C [Limit Notice]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Smiley, John C [Scheduling Hearing]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Smiley, John C [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Smiley, John C [Notice Appointing Trustee]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Smiley, John C [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Smiley, John C [Notice]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice]
    Date Published:August 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Smiley, John C [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Balance Sheet for Small Business]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Ch 11]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.wyb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?50164
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =