U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00145
  • Case Name: Pine Tree Capital LLC et al v. BOKF NA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 19, 2021: [Amended Notice of Appeal]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • January 06, 2021: [Reply Brief]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • December 22, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • December 21, 2020: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • November 02, 2020: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • November 02, 2020: [Transcript Letter]
  • November 02, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • October 22, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • October 22, 2020: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • October 21, 2020: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • October 07, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 07, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 07, 2020: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • October 07, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order]
  • September 04, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • August 26, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 24, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 20, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 20, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 20, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 20, 2020: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • August 20, 2020: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • August 20, 2020: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order]
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 19, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • August 17, 2020: [Objection]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 14, 2020: [Request for Hearing]
  • August 14, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 13, 2020: [Suggestion of Bankruptcy]
  • August 13, 2020: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • August 13, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 13, 2020: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • August 13, 2020: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • August 13, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 13, 2020: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • August 13, 2020: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • August 11, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 10, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • August 03, 2020: [Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.