U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00146
  • Case Name: Craft et al v. State of Wyoming et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • December 09, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • October 14, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • October 05, 2020: [Notice of Joinder]
  • October 05, 2020: [Response to Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 20, 2020: [Stay Case]
  • September 18, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • September 14, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • September 07, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 04, 2020: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • September 04, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 04, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice of Joinder]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • August 24, 2020: [Brief]
  • August 24, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • August 24, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 12, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 12, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • August 12, 2020: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • August 11, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 10, 2020: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • August 06, 2020: [Removal]
  • August 03, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 03, 2020: [Appendix]
  • August 03, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 03, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 03, 2020: [Brief]
  • August 03, 2020: [Dismiss Party]
  • August 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 03, 2020: [Complaint]
  • August 03, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.