U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00149
  • Case Name: Adriance et al v. EOG Resources Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Dismissing Case]
  • April 22, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 03, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 02, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 15, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 07, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 24, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • November 17, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 13, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • October 23, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • October 23, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 23, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 23, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • August 06, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.