U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-20399
  • Case Name: Harry Vito Gambino
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2020
  • November 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Third)]
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment - Generic]
  • August 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
  • August 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • August 11, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • August 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • August 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Social Security Number]
  • August 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • August 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • August 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.