U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-20428
  • Case Name: Jay Dee Cox and Nickteren Kay Cox
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Proposed Order]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 10, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Deadline for Filing Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Compliance With Local Rule 3007-1]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
  • October 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacate]
September, 2020
  • September 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Financial Management Course]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Trustees 341 Minutes]
  • September 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Vacating Order]
  • August 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Reinstate Case]
  • August 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Dismissing Debtor(s)]
  • August 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Notice]
  • August 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 22, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Addendum]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Employee Income Records]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.