U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-20427
  • Case Name: Andrea Nelson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • December 12, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • October 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • October 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Amended List of Creditors (Fee)]
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment - Generic]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 01, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • August 24, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • August 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Proposed Order]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.