U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00164
  • Case Name: Tear Drop Cattle Company LLC v. Devon Energy Production Company LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Response]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 16, 2022: [Response]
  • September 08, 2022: [Objection]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • March 09, 2022: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
  • March 07, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 25, 2022: [Dismissing Case]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 21, 2021: [Response]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 10, 2021: [Objection]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • September 14, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • September 11, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • September 08, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • September 01, 2020: [Opposition]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order]
  • August 31, 2020: [Stay Case]
  • August 31, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 31, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 31, 2020: [Removal]
  • August 27, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • August 26, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 26, 2020: [Third Party Complaint]
  • August 26, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • August 26, 2020: [Complaint]
  • August 26, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.