U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00165
  • Case Name: Gutierrez et al v. Thillot et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Mediation]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Mediation]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • August 19, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 19, 2021: [Vacate]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 12, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 11, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • March 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 04, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • March 03, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 03, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • March 02, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • February 02, 2021: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 01, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • February 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 01, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 08, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 08, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Recusal]
  • August 27, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 27, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • August 27, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.