U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00166
  • Case Name: Hinkel et al v. Colling et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • June 10, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • June 09, 2022: [Default Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • April 29, 2022: [Errata]
  • April 29, 2022: [Strike]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 26, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 22, 2022: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Strike]
  • April 19, 2022: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • April 18, 2022: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • April 15, 2022: [Exhibits]
  • April 15, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 13, 2022: [Request for Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • April 06, 2022: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 01, 2022: [Exhibits]
  • April 01, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2022: [Brief]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order]
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 29, 2022: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • March 28, 2022: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • March 18, 2022: [Supplement]
  • March 18, 2022: [Bifurcate]
  • March 18, 2022: [Exhibits]
  • March 18, 2022: [Brief]
  • March 18, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 18, 2022: [Strike]
  • March 18, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • March 17, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 17, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 17, 2022: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 16, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 10, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 10, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • March 10, 2022: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 18, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 07, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 03, 2022: [Status Conference]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Mediation]
  • January 10, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 07, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 07, 2022: [Statement]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Reply]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 23, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 22, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 11, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
  • November 09, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 08, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Compel]
  • November 01, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 01, 2021: [Compel]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 28, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 24, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • August 11, 2021: [Continue (Dispositive)]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 07, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 18, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 18, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 17, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 16, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 08, 2021: [Compel]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 04, 2021: [Minute Order]
  • June 04, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 03, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • May 05, 2021: [Strike]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • May 04, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 04, 2021: [Dismiss Party]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 23, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • April 07, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
  • March 24, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 24, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 11, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 10, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • February 25, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 19, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 05, 2021: [Quash]
  • February 02, 2021: [Status Conference]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 20, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 13, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • December 22, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 22, 2020: [Intervene]
  • December 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 17, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order]
  • December 09, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 02, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • December 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 17, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 13, 2020: [Reassigning Case]
  • October 08, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • October 08, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 08, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 08, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 21, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 10, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 08, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 08, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 04, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • September 01, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.