U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00167
  • Case Name: Lim et al v. Boone et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 01, 2021: [Transcript Letter]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • June 30, 2021: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • June 29, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • June 17, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [Default Judgment]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 04, 2021: [Certificate of Appealability (NOA)]
  • June 04, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • June 04, 2021: [Default Judgment]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Disqualify]
  • May 18, 2021: [Certificate of Appealability (NOA)]
  • May 18, 2021: [Disqualify]
  • May 13, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 12, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 12, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 12, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Opposition]
  • April 24, 2021: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2021: [Opposition]
  • April 14, 2021: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order]
  • April 13, 2021: [Default Judgment]
  • April 02, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • April 01, 2021: [Status Report Order]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 19, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 15, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 15, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • January 15, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Dismissing Party]
  • December 22, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • December 16, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • December 09, 2020: [Payment Entry]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 09, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 08, 2020: [Status Report Order]
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 03, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 03, 2020: [Dismiss]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 24, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 18, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 04, 2020: [Status Report]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Status Report Order]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • September 18, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • September 17, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 04, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • September 02, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.