U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00169
  • Case Name: Matyszczyk et al v. Traffic Safety Services Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • July 12, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 01, 2022: [Strike]
  • April 01, 2022: [In Limine]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 29, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 29, 2022: [Brief]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • March 24, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 22, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 22, 2022: [Response]
  • March 21, 2022: [Brief]
  • March 21, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 18, 2022: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 18, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 18, 2022: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 16, 2022: [Supplement]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 14, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 07, 2022: [Brief]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Joinder]
  • March 07, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 07, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 07, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 07, 2022: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • March 02, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 01, 2022: [Compel]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 03, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Designation]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 12, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • January 03, 2022: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
December, 2021
  • December 31, 2021: [Request for Hearing]
  • December 29, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 28, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • December 15, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • December 15, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 10, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 08, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 07, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 02, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
November, 2021
  • November 25, 2021: [Quash]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 18, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 17, 2021: [Reply]
  • November 16, 2021: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 10, 2021: [Exhibits]
  • November 10, 2021: [Response]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 26, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 20, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 20, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 20, 2021: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 08, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 14, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 28, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 25, 2021: [Add Party]
  • May 25, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 24, 2021: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 05, 2021: [Compel]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 03, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 09, 2021: [Vacate]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • December 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 24, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 19, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 13, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 24, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 22, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 09, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 04, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.