U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00168
  • Case Name: Barton v. Sweetwater County School District No 2 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • June 01, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Status Report]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 04, 2022: [Reply to Response]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 24, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • February 18, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 14, 2022: [Reconsideration]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 05, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 04, 2022: [Vacate]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Reassigning Case]
  • December 17, 2021: [Statement]
  • December 17, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • December 09, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • December 07, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • December 01, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 19, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • November 19, 2021: [Strike]
  • November 19, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • November 19, 2021: [Statement]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Designation]
  • September 23, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 07, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • September 03, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 16, 2021: [Witness List]
  • August 10, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 16, 2021: [Witness List]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 14, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 09, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 09, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • November 06, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Answer to Notice of Removal]
  • October 13, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 29, 2020: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • September 28, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 11, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • September 11, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • September 11, 2020: [Answer to Notice of Removal]
  • September 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 09, 2020: [Removal]
  • September 04, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 04, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.