U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00173
  • Case Name: Wamser et al v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Former Director et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Deposition]
  • May 20, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • May 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 20, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • May 20, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • May 20, 2022: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • May 20, 2022: [Transcript]
  • May 19, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • May 18, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • May 17, 2022: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • May 17, 2022: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • May 16, 2022: [Quash]
  • May 16, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • May 13, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 13, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 12, 2022: [Objection]
  • May 10, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 10, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 04, 2022: [Return of Subpoena]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 19, 2022: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2022: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • April 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 04, 2022: [In Limine]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 19, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 17, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 04, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Strike]
  • March 04, 2022: [Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • January 18, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 14, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 12, 2022: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 12, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 12, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 16, 2021: [Vacating Hearing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 10, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 02, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 02, 2021: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 27, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • April 27, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 08, 2021: [Reply]
  • April 07, 2021: [Reply]
  • April 02, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 22, 2021: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 08, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • March 08, 2021: [Brief]
  • March 08, 2021: [Stay Case]
  • March 08, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 08, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • March 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Dismissing Party]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order]
  • February 08, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 02, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Status Report]
  • January 12, 2021: [Status Report Order]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Status Report]
  • November 13, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • September 15, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.