U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00174
  • Case Name: Brankov v. Deal Delivery Corporation, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • October 21, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • September 24, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 06, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 09, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • December 01, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Complaint]
  • September 15, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.