U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00176
  • Case Name: Saenz et al v. The Williams Companies Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • December 05, 2022: [Mediation]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Reply]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • November 01, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 24, 2022: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Compel]
  • October 14, 2022: [Witness List]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • September 13, 2022: [Return of Subpoena]
  • September 02, 2022: [Return of Subpoena]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 19, 2022: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • July 19, 2022: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 13, 2022: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 07, 2022: [Return of Subpoena]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 30, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 02, 2022: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 14, 2022: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order]
  • September 03, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 20, 2021: [Protective Order]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • May 19, 2021: [Opposition]
  • May 12, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 05, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • April 21, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 21, 2021: [Financial Entry]
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 19, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 08, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 04, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 04, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • December 04, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • November 10, 2020: [Praecipe]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • September 15, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.