U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00175
  • Case Name: Tolsa Wyoming Bentonite Corp v. Normerica Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • October 04, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • August 24, 2021: [Vacate]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 20, 2021: [Compel]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 09, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 21, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 20, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 11, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 11, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • November 09, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 03, 2020: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Stay Case]
  • October 20, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 13, 2020: [Recusal]
  • October 13, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 02, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 29, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 15, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • September 15, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • September 15, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.