U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00179
  • Case Name: Murphy v. Kautz
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • February 21, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 11, 2022: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 07, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 04, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: [(TRMD)Amended Motion]
  • February 02, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 31, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 26, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 24, 2022: [Mediation]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • December 06, 2021: [Reply Brief]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • November 12, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 03, 2021: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 01, 2021: [Brief]
  • November 01, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 30, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 24, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 23, 2021: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 21, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 16, 2021: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 27, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 03, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 03, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Protective Order]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 26, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • October 16, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 06, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 24, 2020: [Acceptance of Service]
  • September 18, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.