U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00180
  • Case Name: Muhlbeier et al v. Knight Transportation Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Dismissing Case]
  • April 14, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • March 02, 2022: [Supplement]
  • March 02, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 03, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 07, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 29, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 03, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 26, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • May 17, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • May 14, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • May 14, 2021: [Dismiss Party]
  • May 14, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 14, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • May 03, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 28, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 28, 2021: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • April 28, 2021: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • April 22, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 19, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Dismissing Party]
  • February 08, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 13, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 10, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 09, 2020: [Reassigning Case]
  • November 02, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 02, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • November 02, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 21, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice of Complexity]
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 21, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 19, 2020: [Brief]
  • October 19, 2020: [Dismiss Party]
  • October 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 29, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • September 21, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.