U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00183
  • Case Name: Wake Energy LLC v. EOG Resources Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
  • April 09, 2025: [Disbursement of Funds]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Transcript]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 10, 2022: [Supplement]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • September 19, 2022: [Brief]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Certify Class]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Certify Class]
  • July 11, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 27, 2022: [Brief]
  • June 27, 2022: [Certify Class]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 14, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 11, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • January 06, 2022: [Brief]
  • January 06, 2022: [Certify Class]
  • January 06, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 07, 2021: [Status Report]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 17, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Status Report]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 05, 2021: [Status Report]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Stipulation]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 03, 2021: [Protective Order]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • January 07, 2021: [Setting Hearing]
  • January 07, 2021: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • January 07, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • November 30, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • November 30, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 16, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • November 12, 2020: [Reassigning Case]
  • November 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • November 02, 2020: [Brief]
  • November 02, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • November 02, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 02, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 20, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order]
  • October 06, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • September 25, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • September 25, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 24, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 23, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • September 23, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.