U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00187
  • Case Name: Well Water Solutions and Rentals Inc v. Purity Oilfield Services LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • November 02, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • October 16, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 16, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 13, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 06, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • October 06, 2020: [Removal]
  • October 06, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 05, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 05, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
  • October 05, 2020: [Complaint]
  • October 05, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 05, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.