U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00188
  • Case Name: Enpro LLC v. Anadarko E & P Onshore LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • October 19, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2020: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • October 15, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 15, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 06, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • October 06, 2020: [Complaint]
  • October 06, 2020: [Removal]
  • October 06, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 06, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 06, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.