U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00190
  • Case Name: Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company v. Bottger Enterprises Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Dismissing Case]
  • May 25, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • May 12, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2021: [Mediation]
  • March 11, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • March 02, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • March 02, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • January 20, 2021: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • January 19, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 04, 2021: [Jury Demand]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 31, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 31, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • December 31, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 21, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • December 14, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • December 10, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 03, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • November 20, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 19, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 17, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • November 17, 2020: [Praecipe]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 14, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 14, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.