U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00191
  • Case Name: Downer et al v. Bureau of Land Management et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Exhibits]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • February 16, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • November 02, 2020: [Mail Returned]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Exhibits]
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 23, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order]
  • October 22, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • October 21, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 20, 2020: [Notice of Consent for Electronic Notification (Pro Se)]
  • October 20, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 20, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 20, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • October 19, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 15, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • October 15, 2020: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • October 15, 2020: [Application]
  • October 15, 2020: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.