U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00192
  • Case Name: Wright v. Cheyenne Police Department Officer Howe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • October 13, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 24, 2021: [Dismiss]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Compel]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 13, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 05, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 19, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • February 19, 2021: [Letter(s)]
  • February 04, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • December 23, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • December 23, 2020: [Letter(s)]
  • December 23, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 23, 2020: [Response]
  • December 15, 2020: [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
  • December 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 09, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 09, 2020: [Letter(s)]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 21, 2020: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 16, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 16, 2020: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.