U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00194
  • Case Name: Carter v. State of Wyoming et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Letter(s)]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 03, 2021: [Reconsideration]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 09, 2020: [Dismissing Case]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.