U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00195
  • Case Name: Khan Howard Johnson LLC v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • July 25, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 25, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • June 28, 2022: [Transcript Letter]
  • June 28, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • June 28, 2022: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • June 28, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • June 21, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • June 06, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • June 03, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • June 03, 2022: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 25, 2022: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Cross Appeal]
  • May 24, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 24, 2022: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 23, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 19, 2022: [Mediation]
  • May 19, 2022: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • May 06, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Affidavit]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • April 25, 2022: [(TRMD)Order on Motion for Directed Verdict]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 22, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 14, 2022: [Strike]
  • April 08, 2022: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • April 04, 2022: [Reply to Response]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 28, 2022: [Strike]
  • March 28, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 21, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • March 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2022: [Directed Verdict]
  • March 14, 2022: [Transcript]
  • March 04, 2022: [Reply to Response]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 28, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • February 28, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
  • February 26, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 22, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
  • February 17, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • February 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 14, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • February 14, 2022: [JERS Exhibits]
  • February 14, 2022: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • February 14, 2022: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 14, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 11, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 10, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • February 09, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • February 09, 2022: [Deposition]
  • February 08, 2022: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • February 08, 2022: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 31, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 26, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • January 26, 2022: [Witness List]
  • January 25, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 24, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • January 21, 2022: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • January 21, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • January 18, 2022: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 18, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • January 18, 2022: [Response]
  • January 11, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • January 11, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 11, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 06, 2022: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • January 05, 2022: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • January 04, 2022: [In Limine]
  • January 03, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 03, 2022: [Brief]
  • January 03, 2022: [Strike]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 18, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 17, 2021: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • September 17, 2021: [Witness List]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 06, 2021: [Show Cause]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 22, 2021: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 22, 2021: [Compel]
  • July 21, 2021: [Compel]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 01, 2021: [Compel]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 04, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [Protective Order]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 11, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 11, 2021: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 04, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 20, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 13, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Compel]
  • March 23, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • March 03, 2021: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • March 03, 2021: [Hearing - Dispositive]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • January 13, 2021: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 13, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 01, 2020: [Jury Demand]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 30, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • November 30, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 30, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Complaint]
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.