U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00197
  • Case Name: Hamm v. Basin Electric Power Cooperative
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • February 25, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Mediation]
  • January 07, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 31, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 23, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 23, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 12, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • August 02, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 02, 2021: [Vacate]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 21, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 13, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 18, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 03, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • November 13, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 12, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 02, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • October 26, 2020: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • October 26, 2020: [Complaint (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.