U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00202
  • Case Name: Rhoades v. Rhoades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Dismissing Case]
  • May 04, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 16, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 19, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 12, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 22, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 22, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • December 22, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • December 21, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • December 21, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • December 11, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 11, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • December 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 02, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 23, 2020: [Response]
  • November 20, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 05, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • October 30, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • October 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 30, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.