U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00010
  • Case Name: Kumpf v. C & A Transport LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Dismissing Case]
  • July 20, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • July 20, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • June 28, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • June 28, 2021: [Exhibits]
  • June 28, 2021: [Supplement]
  • June 23, 2021: [Objection]
  • June 23, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • June 23, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 22, 2021: [Designation]
  • June 17, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • June 11, 2021: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • June 09, 2021: [Response]
  • June 04, 2021: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • June 03, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 04, 2021: [Mediation]
  • May 04, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Opposition]
  • April 23, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order]
  • April 16, 2021: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • April 16, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order]
  • April 15, 2021: [Mediation/Settlement Conference]
  • April 09, 2021: [Response]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order]
  • April 05, 2021: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 05, 2021: [Strike]
  • April 05, 2021: [In Limine]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 02, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 02, 2021: [In Limine]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 18, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order]
  • January 26, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • January 14, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 12, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 12, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 11, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.