U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00199
  • Case Name: Tennant v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • March 10, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 05, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.