U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00201
  • Case Name: Beck v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • May 21, 2021: [Bill of Costs]
  • May 13, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • May 12, 2021: [Remand]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
  • May 12, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 12, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 08, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Financial Entry]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 03, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 02, 2020: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.