U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00006
  • Case Name: Phillips & Jordan Inc v. Erosion Control Applications Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • July 23, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 19, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 04, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 20, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 12, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 06, 2021: [Mediation]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 10, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 08, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 01, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 02, 2020: [Stipulation of Facts]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.