U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00203
  • Case Name: Young v. Wyoming Attorney General
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 28, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 28, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice of Consent for Electronic Notification (Pro Se)]
  • January 06, 2021: [Notice of Consent for Electronic Notification (Pro Se)]
  • January 06, 2021: [Reconsideration]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • November 03, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 03, 2020: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.