U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00068
  • Case Name: Houska v. Newkota Services & Rentals LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 08, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 06, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • March 04, 2022: [Quash]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 02, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Joinder]
  • March 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 22, 2022: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • February 22, 2022: [In Limine]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 21, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 18, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • February 18, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: [Supplement]
  • February 09, 2022: [Supplement]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • February 04, 2022: [Supplement]
  • February 03, 2022: [Request for Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 28, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 27, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 27, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 21, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 18, 2022: [Witness List]
  • January 17, 2022: [Strike]
  • January 17, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 17, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 14, 2022: [Strike]
  • January 14, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 14, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 04, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 03, 2021: [Witness List]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 18, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 04, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • August 23, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 04, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Praecipe]
  • July 21, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Add Party]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 15, 2021: [Add Party]
  • July 15, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 04, 2021: [Status Conference]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 27, 2021: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 04, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.