U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00065
  • Case Name: Great American Assurance Company et al v. Interstate Fire & Casualty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Dismissing Case]
  • June 29, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 02, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 23, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 23, 2021: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • November 29, 2021: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • November 29, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 14, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Objection]
  • April 21, 2021: [Reply]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2021: [Opposition]
  • April 07, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • March 10, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 10, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • January 13, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.