U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00188
  • Case Name: Enpro LLC v. Anadarko E & P Onshore LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • November 10, 2021: [Response]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Strike]
  • October 29, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 22, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • October 19, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 13, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order]
  • October 08, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 08, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 22, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 21, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 15, 2021: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • September 02, 2021: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Status Conference]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 01, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 04, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 21, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 14, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 09, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 05, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.