U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00206
  • Case Name: Campbell County Hospital District v. Utah Medical Insurance Association
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Transcript]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 20, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 05, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 05, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 22, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • October 01, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • July 06, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 01, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 17, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 17, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 09, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • June 09, 2021: [Errata]
  • June 07, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 24, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 21, 2021: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • April 19, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 06, 2021: [Intervene]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 19, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 07, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • December 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 04, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • November 09, 2020: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • November 09, 2020: [Complaint (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.