U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00207
  • Case Name: Pollard et al v. Hydro Horse 1 Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • April 23, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 01, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice of IPT Conference]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 22, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 22, 2021: [Status Report Order]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 12, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • November 12, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • November 12, 2020: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • November 10, 2020: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • November 10, 2020: [Complaint (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.