U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00208
  • Case Name: Blue Water Innovations, LLC v. Vevazz, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Court)]
  • December 28, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 20, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 15, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • December 15, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • December 06, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 10, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 10, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 10, 2021: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order]
  • July 22, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 08, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 07, 2021: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 02, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 01, 2021: [Praecipe]
  • July 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Third Party Complaint]
  • June 17, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 17, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 07, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 27, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 25, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 25, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 11, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 11, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • May 11, 2021: [Third Party Complaint]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • April 22, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 30, 2021: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • March 12, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • March 11, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • March 05, 2021: [Response to Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 19, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 19, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • February 10, 2021: [Status Report]
  • February 03, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 18, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 13, 2021: [Financial Entry]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 03, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2020: [Setting Hearing]
  • December 14, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • December 14, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 11, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order]
  • November 10, 2020: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • November 10, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 10, 2020: [Case Transferred to Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.