U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00267
  • Case Name: Devon Energy Production Company LP v. Justice Oil & Gas LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • March 29, 2021: [Suggestion of Bankruptcy]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 27, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 15, 2021: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Witness List]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 17, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.